THE NEW COLLEGE OF COBHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of sheltered housing for the elderly
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
- Medway
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek George Butler | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||
PHILIP FILMER | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||
RUSSELL GRAHAM COOPER | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
MICHELE JACKSON | Trustee | 08 October 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
rosemary dymond | Trustee | 08 October 2012 |
|
|||||||||||||||
JOHN ANTHONY OGDEN DL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £202.31k | £208.78k | £215.82k | £222.58k | £235.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.71k | £131.33k | £184.37k | £204.71k | £401.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 April 2025 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 April 2025 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 April 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 April 2024 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 April 2023 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 April 2023 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 April 2022 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 April 2022 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 August 2021 | 206 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 August 2021 | 206 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 17/08/1978 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 09/08/1994 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19/10/2015
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR PENSIONERS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND HAVE RESIDED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (THE PARISHES OF CHALK, CLIFFE, COBHAM, COOLING, CUXTON, GRAVESEND, HALLING, HIGHAM, HOO, SHORNE AND STROOD.) FOR NOT LESS THAN THREE YEARS NEXT PRECEDING THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEW COLLEGE OF COBHAM
COBHAMBURY ROAD
COBHAM
NR.GRAVESEND
DA12 3BG
- Phone:
- 01474812503
- Email:
- cobcol@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window