THE WARDENS AND ASSISTANTS OF ROCHESTER BRIDGE IN THE COUNTY OF KENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The maintenance and improvement of two road bridges and a services bridge (known as Rochester Bridge). Care of and access to archives and historical artefacts. The promotion of other charitable purposes through projects and the award of grants for education and research in engineering, agriculture & history; heritage structures; and charitable purposes connected to the River Medway.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,703,270
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £3.70m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£4,052,851
Raising funds | £1.79m | |
Charitable activities | £2.26m | |
Other | £0 |
£12,938,605 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.79m | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.26m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.79m | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.26m | |
Retained for future use | £12.59m |
People

16 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bexley
- Bromley
- Cambridgeshire
- Kent
- Kirklees
- Lincolnshire
- Medway
- Suffolk
- West Sussex
Governance
- 30 May 1962: Standard registration
- 16 August 2013: Funds received from 277010 THE MEDWAY HERITAGE CENTRE TRUST
- ROCHESTER BRIDGE TRUST (Working name)
- THE ROCHESTER BRIDGE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE WARDENS AND ASSISTANTS OF THE ROCHESTER BRIDGE IN THE COUNTY OF KENT (Previous name)
- THE WARDENS AND ASSISTANTS OF THE ROCHESTER BRIDGE TRUST IN THE COUNTY OF KENT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEREK GEORGE BUTLER | Chair | 01 June 2015 |
|
|||||||||||
Dr Helen Marie Pascoe BScMScPGCE | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
John Farmer CEng MICE | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Sarah Virginia Hohler | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Lars Lemonius | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Raymond Peter Harris | Trustee | 01 June 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
PHILIP FILMER | Trustee | 04 October 2011 |
|
|||||||||||
RUSSELL GRAHAM COOPER | Trustee | 30 April 2007 |
|
|
||||||||||
ALAN LESLIE JARRETT | Trustee | 01 June 2005 |
|
|||||||||||
Russell John Race | Trustee | 01 June 2004 |
|
|||||||||||
RICHARD GEORGE THORNBY | Trustee | 01 June 1997 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr ANNE FRANCES HELEN LOGAN | Trustee | 01 June 1997 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.42m | £2.98m | £3.38m | £3.42m | £3.70m | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.98m | £9.53m | £3.89m | £4.12m | £4.05m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.42m | £2.98m | £3.38m | £3.42m | £3.70m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £9.05m | £7.34m | £1.40m | £2.10m | £2.26m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.93m | £2.19m | £2.49m | £2.02m | £1.79m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £61.30k | £63.37k | £108.91k | £124.71k | £122.97k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £129.23k | £31.91k | £92.54k | £51.85k | £32.90k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £1.93m | £2.19m | £2.49m | £2.02m | £1.79m | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.88m | £2.19m | £2.68m | £3.04m | £3.10m | |
|
Long-term investments | £93.07m | £106.05m | £114.93m | £114.01m | £125.17m | |
|
Other assets | £13.97m | £6.68m | £2.94m | £3.87m | £4.86m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | -£213.00k | -£223.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.70m | £1.50m | £1.21m | £1.46m | £1.16m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
STATUTORY INSTRUMENT ROCHESTER BRIDGE ACTS AND MEDWAY TUNNEL ACT 26/07/1990 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 01/06/1999 THE CHARITIES (ROCHESTER BRIDGE TRUSTS) ORDER 30/11/2000 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 20/06/2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 31/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29/10/2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 30/12/2013 AS AMENDED ON 01/09/2014 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11 JAN 2018 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12 MAR 2018 AS AMENDED ON 19 FEB 2019 AS AMENDED ON 01 MAR 2021 AS AMENDED ON 23 MAY 2022 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20 MAY 2024
Charitable objects
(1) THE MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE BRIDGES (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS ROCHESTER BRIDGE)AND THE APPROACHES THERETO BELONGING TO THE CHARITY AND OF THE BANKS AND CHANNEL OF THE RIVER MEDWAY SO FAR AS THE CONDITIONS THEREOF MAY AFFECT THE MAINTENANCE OF ROCHESTER BRIDGE.(2) THE PROMOTION OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE RIVER MEDWAY BY MEANS OF CONTRIBUTIONS TO: (A) THE EXECUTION AND MAINTENANCE OF WORKS (INCLUDING THE APPROACHES THERETO, WHETHER OR NOT BELONGING TO THE CHARITY) TENDING TO FACILITATE THE PASSAGE OVER, UNDER OR ACROSS THE RIVER MEDWAY; AND/OR (B) THE EXECUTION OF WORKS FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF THE BANKS AND CHANNELS OF THE RIVER MEDWAY SO FAR AS THE CONDITION THEREOF MAY AFFECT PASSAGE OVER, UNDER OR ACROSS THE RIVER MEDWAY; (3) THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND PRIMARILY IN THE COUNTY OF KENT.
Area of benefit
PLEASE SEE OBJECTS FOR DETAILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rochester Bridge Trust
St. Andrews House
The Precinct
ROCHESTER
Kent
ME1 1SU
- Phone:
- 01634846706
- Email:
- enquiries@rbt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window