Financial history UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES

Charity number: 207178
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £3.23k £20.12k £19.01k £19.83k £22.83k
Total expenditure £3.06k £11.95k £34.92k £16.71k £6.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £876
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A