THE HOUSE OF ST BARNABAS

Charity Number: 207242

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The House of St Barnabas has been supporting those affected by homelessness for over 160 years, helping them to bring about a positive change in their lives by offering a unique Life Skills Programme.The Programme provides participants with personal development coaching, therapies focused on mental and physical well-being, practical and classroom-based hospitality training.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 May 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • HOUSE OF ST BARNABAS-IN-SOHO (OTHERWISE THE HOUSE OF CHARITY FOR DISTRESSED PERSONS IN LONDON) (Previous name)
  • THE HOUSE OF ST BARNABAS-IN-SOHO (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JENNIFER WATSON CBE Chair 13 March 2018
None on record
Kate Shoesmith Trustee 15 November 2022
None on record
Tyler Williams-Green Trustee 15 November 2022
None on record
Richard Taunt Trustee 30 November 2021
None on record
Robi Sol Elsawey Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Katherine Ruth SWADE Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
STEPHEN ERIC BURNS Trustee 24 March 2020
UNITED ST SAVIOUR'S CHARITY
Received: On time
TRUST FOR LONDON TRUSTEE
Received: On time
TOYNBEE HALL
Received: On time
Karen Everett Trustee 13 November 2018
GATSBY AFRICA
Received: On time
LONDON NARROW BOAT PROJECT
Received: On time
DYNAMIC YOUTH THEATRE
Received: On time
ASSOCIATION OF CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS
Received: On time
James Townsend Trustee 13 November 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £2.31m £2.21m £1.61m £2.87m £3.05m
Total expenditure £2.28m £2.19m £1.75m £2.78m £3.50m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £8.36k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £588.43k £808.42k £770.61k £716.11k £784.96k
Income - Other trading activities £1.07m £1.20m £609.32k £1.90m £2.25m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £646.04k £199.90k £234.47k £254.00k £13.41k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.08m £960.14k £725.46k £786.17k £867.27k
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.15m £1.22m £1.00m £1.99m £389.92k
Expenditure - Governance £44.74k £64.08k £64.08k £38.47k £27.76k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £44.20k £5.33k £24.15k £0 £2.24m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Own use assets £1.97m £1.96m £1.86m £1.73m £1.60m
Long-term investments £0 £1 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £838.17k £692.35k £886.85k £1.21m £1.11m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.04m £855.84k £1.09m £1.20m £1.45m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024
Annual return 31 March 2023
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023
Annual return 31 March 2022
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022
Annual return 31 March 2021
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 6 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO AFFORD TEMPORARY RELIEF TO DESERVING PERSONS SPECIALLY RECOMMENDED AND SELECTED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 12 May 2009 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
EVELYN PARTNERS LLP
45 GRESHAM STREET
LONDON
EC2V 7BG
Phone:
02071314000
Website:

WWW.EVELYN.COM