Financial history COWDRAY LIVINGS TRUST

Charity number: 207285
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £843 £213 £189 £3.23k £292
Total expenditure £2.23k £1.36k £74 £4.18k £12.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A