THE SOCIETY FOR RELIEF OF WIDOWS AND ORPHANS OF MEDICAL MEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides financial assistance to necessitous doctors and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 October 1962: Standard registration
- 07 June 1995: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SOCIETY FOR ASSISTANCE OF MEDICAL FAMILIES (Working name)
- THE WIDOWS AND ORPHANS (Working name)
- THE SOCIETY FOR THE RELIEF OF WIDOWS AND ORPHANS OF MEDICAL MEN (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Buckle | Chair | 24 May 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Dr Christine Tomkins | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Robert Lyn Michael Griffiths | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Naomi Jiagbogu | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
LYDIA ACQUAH | Trustee | 05 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr DAVID STEWART | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
DR ROHIT MALLIWAL | Trustee | 21 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
GEOFFREY EDWARD ROSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Dr STEWART MATHESON KILPATRICK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Dr CELIA PALMER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
SIMON DAVID WILLIAM PAYNE MB BS FRCS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Dr ROY NEWBERRY PALMER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £268.86k | £218.78k | £240.90k | £248.19k | £237.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £176.34k | £192.69k | £183.99k | £166.77k | £233.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 5 APRIL 1864 AS AMENDED 14 MAY 1975 AND SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER OF 12 MARCH 1980, ORDERS 16 MARCH 1983, 16 MARCH 1989 AND SCHEME OF 23 OCT. 1989 AND BY-LAWS MADE UNDER THE AUTHORITY OF THE ROYAL CHARTER AND ADOPTED ON 24 MAY 2007.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF DISTRESSED WIDOWS AND ORPHANS OF DECEASED MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY. IF, AND IN SO FAR AS THE SAID INCOME IN ANY YEAR IS NOT REQUIRED FOR APPLICATION AS AFORESAID THE SOCIETY MAY, SUBJECT TO OBSERVING THE SAME CONDITION IN RELATION TO EACH CLASS SUCCESSIVELY ENUMERATED BELOW, APPLY THE SAID INCOME FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN THE FOLLOWING CLASSES:- (A) NECESSITOUS DEPENDANTS OF DECEASED MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY (B) NECESSITOUS MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY (C) NECESSITOUS DEPENDANTS OF MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY (D) NECESSITOUS MEDICAL PRACTITIONERS NOT BEING MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY AND THE NECESSITOUS DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PRACTITIONERS WHETHER DECEASED OR NOT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 24 October 1962 : Standard registration
- 07 June 1995 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
LETTSOM HOUSE
11 CHANDOS STREET
LONDON
W1G 9EB
- Phone:
- 07771300410
- Email:
- info@samf.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window