Financial history THE MAITLAND TRUST

Charity Number: 207664
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £12.69k £15.94k £13.29k £13.34k £13.53k
Total expenditure £13.99k £12.81k £13.79k £13.17k £13.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A