THE BISHOP'S CASTLE COUNTY ELECTORAL DIVISION SICK POOR FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
charitable donations to worthy and deserving individuals living in the Bishop's Castle County Electoral Division only.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Shropshire
Governance
- 01 May 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VERONICA MARY GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
VANESSA MORRIS | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANITA JANE BRIGHT | Trustee | 19 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
GLENYS RITA LEWIS | Trustee | 19 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA MARGARET LEEKE | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANNE FRANCIS LEWIS | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROGER JOHN TAYLOR | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|||||
Rev Stephanie Fountain | Trustee | 28 November 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.56k | £3.65k | £4.16k | £4.33k | £4.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.50k | £1.33k | £1.50k | £1.70k | £2.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 February 2024 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF 18TH OCTOBER 1940 AND 20TH SEPTEMBER 1949
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SICK POOR PERSONS OF THE COUNTY ELECTORAL DIVISION OF BISHOP'S CASTLE AS CONSTITUED IN 1912. (FOR DETAILS SEE SCHEME OF 20TH SEPTEMBER, 1949)
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Welsh Street
Bishops Castle
SY9 5BS
- Phone:
- 01588638355
- Email:
- rjt@orielhouse.eclipse.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window