JAMES PEEK TRUST FUNDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to provide first and foremost for the support and assistance of the descendants of James Peek, secondly for the support and assistance of any of his relatives who shall be descended from his father, John Peek and, thirdly, for others who may be in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Panama
- South Africa
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEREMY CHARLES CLARKE-WILLIAMS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Charles Johnstone | Trustee | 12 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tom Finch | Trustee | 07 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Emma Katharine Poole | Trustee | 21 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER PATRICK FREAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MERLE CATHERINE ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JILL HELEN MATHEW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIR ROBERT PHILIP WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIR RICHARD GRENVILLE PEEK | Trustee |
|
||||||
RICHARD ANTHONY HENEAGE FINCH | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr FRANCESCA IO EPSTEIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.67k | £18.02k | £18.52k | £19.55k | £19.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.16k | £13.36k | £17.89k | £17.95k | £19.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 17 MARCH 1885 AS VARIED BY AN ORDER OF 3 OCTOBER 1960 AND SCHEME OF 26 OCTOBER 1966
Charitable objects
BENEFIT OF SUCH PERSONS AS BEING ADULTS SHALL BE OF GOOD CHARACTER AND REPUTE, AND FROM THEIR CIRCUMSTANCES IN LIFE SHALL NEED SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE WITH A PREFERENCE FOR SUHC AS BEING OTHERWISE QUALIFIED AS AFORESAID SHALL HAVE BECOME REDUCED BY MISFORTUNE FROM BETTER CIRCUMSTANCES. JAMES PEEK AND OF HIS FATHER JOHN PEEK OF HAZELWOOD, LODDISWELL, DEVONSHIRE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Linked charities
- 22 September 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 DAGDEN ROAD
SHALFORD
GUILDFORD
GU4 8DD
- Phone:
- 01483301229
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window