Financial history THE BACKHAM ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 208498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £39.00k £24.80k £27.00k £25.32k £24.88k
Total expenditure £22.00k £20.30k £29.00k £16.35k £23.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A