MARKET WESTON UNITED CHARITIES

Charity Number: 208549
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief in need.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £4,022
Total expenditure: £4,457

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • POOR'S FUEL ALLOTMENT (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Valerie May Goff Chair 11 December 2018
None on record
Robert John Snelling Trustee 18 October 2022
None on record
Rosemary Macdonald Trustee 11 December 2018
None on record
Rev Catherine Robin Bladen Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
Darryl Fulcher Trustee 01 March 2015
None on record
SUSAN MAUREEN AUSTIN Trustee
None on record
Miranda Felicity Martin Trustee
MARKET WESTON VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
SAMARITANS OF BURY ST EDMUNDS AND WEST SUFFOLK
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.85k £3.83k £4.05k £4.01k £4.02k
Total expenditure £4.45k £2.89k £4.72k £4.38k £4.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 10 NOVEMBER 1976
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF MARKET WESTON WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS
Area of benefit
FORMER ANCIENT PARISH OF MARKET WESTON
Registration history
  • 22 September 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
The Barn
Church Road
Market Weston
Diss
Norfolk
IP22 2NX
Phone:
01359 221529
Website:

No information available