ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF GEORGE WHITE

Charity number: 208601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity offers financial aid to the elderly and young living with preference in the Parish of Hutton. Requests are considered and approved by the trustees before aid is granted. Needs are often highlighted by local priests, church workers and headteachers. Monies from this charity are also allocated towards the maintenance of the church fabric in the two parish churches of Hutton.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £22,710
Total expenditure: £15,186

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 March 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ben Rigby Trustee 05 October 2023
None on record
Jason Manning Trustee 07 May 2018
HUTTON CHARITY (BAKER, MARTIN AND WHITE)
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS' WITH SAINT PETER HUTTON
Received: On time
Robert Yarwood Trustee 07 July 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS' WITH SAINT PETER HUTTON
Received: On time
HUTTON CHARITY (BAKER, MARTIN AND WHITE)
Received: On time
Roger Hirst Cllr Trustee 16 July 2014
HUTTON CHARITY (BAKER, MARTIN AND WHITE)
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £15.36k £15.66k £25.66k £15.16k £22.71k
Total expenditure £20.30k £15.78k £25.65k £15.21k £15.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 23 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Old Rectory
Hutton Village
Hutton
BRENTWOOD
CM13 1RX
Phone:
01277210495