THE TORCH TRUST FOR THE BLIND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Torch Trust for the Blind aims to overcome sight loss as a barrier to finding a personal faith in Christ and living a fulfilled Christian life. It provides Christian literature, fellowship and personal support to visually impaired people in the UK and around the world. This Charity is the original charity set up by Torch, all current activities are undertaken through charity number 1095904
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- TORCH FAMILY (Working name)
- TORCH FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- TORCH TRUST (Working name)
- TORCH BLIND FUND TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY BROWN | Chair | 16 July 2014 |
|
|||||||
Philip Rice | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|||||||
Brian William Anderson | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sheila Armstrong | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|||||||
Ifeolu Omoniyi Akintunde | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
MARILYN BAKER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2024 | 362 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | Download Open in new window | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17TH JANUARY 1952 AND SCHEME OF THE 30TH AUGUST 1972
Charitable objects
TO EDIT AND CIRCULATE "THE TORCH", AND EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN MAGAZINE FOR THE BLIND. MAINTAIN A BRAILLE RELIGIOUS LIBRARY. GENERAL CHARITABLE AND WELFARE WORK AMONGST THE BLIND. (FOR FURTHER PARTICULARS SEE CLAUSE 1 OF TRUST DEED).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
TORCH HOUSE
TORCH WAY
NORTHAMPTON ROAD
MARKET HARBOROUGH
LEICS
LE16 9HL
- Phone:
- 01858438260
- Email:
- info@torchtrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window