PROVISION TRADE BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION

Charity number: 209173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide financial assistance to former employees of the provision and allied trades together with their surviving widows and widowers

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £54,941
Total expenditure: £74,381

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 September 1987: Standard registration
  • 11 October 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • P T B I (Working name)
  • THE PROVISION TRADE CHARITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alexander Hume Trustee 24 June 2024
None on record
Clare Cheney Trustee 16 November 2023
None on record
Mike Mills Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Brian Murrell Trustee 07 August 2020
None on record
Philip John Langslow Trustee 02 November 2018
None on record
John Nicholas Howard Trustee 21 June 2017
None on record
Geoff Pearce Trustee 01 July 2014
None on record
CHARLES LEONARD STORR Trustee 16 August 2013
None on record
MR TONY STANTON Trustee 27 September 2011
None on record
SARAH ELIZABETH DAVIES Trustee
None on record
CHARLES RICHARD STEPHEN LINK Trustee
HELEN ROBERTSON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE EVERSLEY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE FISHMONGERS' AND POULTERERS' INSTITUTION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £50.28k £38.82k £44.29k £46.53k £54.94k
Total expenditure £75.53k £72.99k £64.82k £81.98k £74.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 24 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
RULES AND APPEAL DATED 29/10/1985
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF NECESSITOUS PERSONS CONNECTED WITH THE PROVISIONS TRADE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 29 September 1987 : Standard registration
  • 11 October 2022 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
PROVISION TRADE BENEVOLENT INST
17 CLERKENWELL GREEN
LONDON
EC1R 0DP
Phone:
02072532114