THE QUEEN ALEXANDRA COTTAGE HOMES

Charity number: 209208
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is overdue by 834 days

Charity overview

Regulatory alerts

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of a range of accommodation and support to local older people which is designed to enable them to live as full and independent a life as possible

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 October 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER AUSTIN Trustee 28 September 2011
None on record
Neil Derek Rogers Trustee 01 September 2002
None on record
IAN MICHAEL ALEXANDER STEWART Trustee
ROY HUDSON TRUST
Received: On time
MRS A LACY TATE TRUST
Received: 2 days late
JOHN AND IRENE FOSTER CHARITY
Received: On time
PEACE MEMORIAL HALL - HERSTMONCEUX
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.87m £1.92m £1.93m £2.07m £2.14m
Total expenditure £2.02m £2.18m £2.19m £2.31m £2.31m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.24k £12.17k £1.60k £33.16k £35.90k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.87m £1.91m £1.93m £2.03m £2.10m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.60k £1.60k £1.98k £859 £56
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £28.78k £10.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.02m £2.18m £2.19m £2.31m £2.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £8.67k £7.10k £12.66k £10.95k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Own use assets £5.03m £4.87m £4.69m £4.51m £4.36m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £994.94k £764.75k £439.18k £247.91k £199.70k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £3.08m £2.94m £2.70m £2.57m £2.55m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 103 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 103 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 469 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 469 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 834 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 834 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 April 2022 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 April 2025 1158 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 April 2022 444 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 December 2024 1411 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED 31 OCTOBER 1960
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A BLOCK OF BUILDINGS FOR GENTLEFOLK IN REDUCED CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 29 October 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
557 SEASIDE
EASTBOURNE
EAST SUSSEX
BN23 6NE
Phone:
01323739689