THE FIRST CHURCH OF CHRIST, SCIENTIST IN BOSTON, MASSACHUSETTS, COMMITTEE FOR CHRISTIAN SCIENCE NURSING ACTIVITIES (UK)

Charity number: 209731
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To aid Christian Scientists to enter Christian Science Houses for the purpose of receiving nursing care, and to benefit Christian Science Houses by assisting with the cost of building and maintenance and the purchase of equipment.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2011

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £1,500

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 December 1980: Standard registration
  • 01 February 2012: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
  • 01 February 2012: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • THE A FUND AND THE B FUND (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2007 30/04/2008 30/04/2009 30/04/2010 30/04/2011
Total gross income £305 £0 £3.09k £0 £0
Total expenditure £8.86k £0 £0 £0 £1.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2011 20 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2010 09 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2010 Not Required

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 02/12/1980 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18/08/2011
Charitable objects
FOR AIDING CHRISTIAN SCIENTISTS TO ENTER CHRISTIAN SCIENCE HOUSES FOR PURPOSES OF NURSING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 02 December 1980 : Standard registration
  • 01 February 2012 : Removed
  • 01 February 2012 : Asset transfer out