ONE WORLD TRUST

Charity number: 210180
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The One World Trust promotes education, training and research into the changes required within global organisations in order to make them answerable to the people they affect and ensure that international laws are strengthened and applied equally to all. The Trust's work is centred on three programmes: Accountability, Peace and Security, Sustainable Development.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • OWT (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT WHITFIELD Chair
ONE WORLD TRUST
Received: On time
Dr SYLVIA KARLSSON Trustee
None on record
Dr GAVIN STRANG Trustee
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 April 2024 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 April 2024 446 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Coombe Head
Tresham
WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE
GL12 7RW
Phone:
01666890338
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available