THE BENEVOLENT FUND OF HER MAJESTY'S INSPECTORS OF SCHOOLS IN ENGLAND AND WALES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing loans and grants to retired HMI and their deppendents at times of acute need Providing pastoral support, including advice, to retired HMI and their dependents Developing an educational information, news and comment internal web site Working with London University Insitute of Education to establish an on-line archive giving insights into HMIs work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 August 1962: Standard registration
- THE BENEVOLENT FUND OF HM INSPECTORS OF SCHOOLS IN ENGLAND AND WALES (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Green | Chair | 07 April 2017 |
|
|||||||
Bradley Simmons | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Davinder Dosanjh | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
Dr Rashida Sharif | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
Gill Oldham | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Stewart Robertson | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Colin Richards | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Mark Sims | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Adrian Lyons | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Ramesh Kapadia | Trustee | 03 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Georgina White | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Margaret Swift | Trustee | 07 April 2017 |
|
|||||||
Diane Elizabeth Simmonds | Trustee | 12 June 2014 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN HERTRICH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.01k | £44.01k | £50.41k | £7.87k | £8.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.66k | £36.34k | £47.91k | £54.66k | £47.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 22 APRIL 1994
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PRESENT AND RETIRED HER MAJESTY'S INSPECTORS OF SCHOOLS AND THEIR DEPENDENTS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
AHMI
PO Box 850
ROTHERHAM
South Yorkshire
S60 9QE
- Phone:
- 07894883459
- Email:
- Linda.crookes@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window