ROYAL ARTILLERY CHARITABLE FUND

Charity Number: 210202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting efficiency and welfare of all ranks serving in the Royal Artillery, incl TA. Relief and assistance to past and present members of the Royal Artillery and their dependants who are in need Grants to soldiers and officers, serving or retired who are in need.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Germany
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 February 1988: Standard registration
  • 21 February 2008: Removed
  • 21 February 2008: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Major General David Cullen CB, OBE Chair 15 December 2016
ROYAL ARTILLERY INSTITUTION LIMITED
Received: On time
Colonel Philip Ashley Haigh Trustee 23 April 2025
None on record
Colonel Patrick James Farrell OBE ADC Trustee 15 January 2025
THE ROYAL ARTILLERY GENERAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
ROYAL ARTILLERY INSTITUTION LIMITED
Received: On time
Colonel David Alexander Butt Trustee 29 July 2024
ROYAL ARTILLERY INSTITUTION LIMITED
Received: On time
William B de C Cussans Trustee 12 June 2024
None on record
James Lee Lightfoot Trustee 31 May 2024
THE ROYAL ARTILLERY GENERAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
ROYAL ARTILLERY INSTITUTION LIMITED
Received: On time
Colonel Stuart Ian Hay Trustee 22 April 2024
ROYAL ARTILLERY INSTITUTION LIMITED
Received: On time
Colonel Benjamin Matthew David Ingham MBE Trustee 22 November 2023
ROYAL ARTILLERY INSTITUTION LIMITED
Received: On time
Colonel Richard Andrew Forster Trustee 09 October 2023
ROYAL ARTILLERY INSTITUTION LIMITED
Received: On time
Lieutenant Colonel Simon John Howe Trustee 08 December 2021
None on record
BRIGADIER MARK NICHOLAS POUNTAIN CBE Trustee 23 March 2018
Entrain Space Trust
Received: On time
Col Michael Relph MBE Trustee 25 October 2017
THE KENNET VALLEY AT WAR TRUST
Received: On time
COLONEL CHRISTOPHER COMPORT OBE TD DL Trustee 01 December 2015
LICHFIELD AND BILSTON DRILL HALLS TRUST FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.31m £1.55m £1.32m £1.79m £1.58m
Total expenditure £1.76m £992.01k £1.06m £1.44m £1.60m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £629.05k £722.90k £607.46k £938.90k £638.90k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £8.65k £129.35k £9.37k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £669.88k £807.86k £706.60k £715.27k £761.76k
Income - Other £9.89k £15.31k £716 £7.13k £167.29k
Income - Legacies £30.55k £48.43k £188.74k £451.03k £156.23k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.73m £991.40k £988.16k £1.44m £1.46m
Expenditure - Raising funds £29.07k £616 £70.79k £1.18k £10.70k
Expenditure - Governance £16.75k £23.87k £16.28k £23.51k £22.52k
Expenditure - Grants institution £809.39k £505.65k £224.89k £32.72k £1.05m
Expenditure - Investment management £27.41k £0 £68.73k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £122.71k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £954.00k £932.80k £911.60k £911.60k £869.20k
Long-term investments £34.13m £33.73m £37.20m £38.38m £36.42m
Other assets £725.68k £1.01m £1.35m £2.26m £2.39m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £362.71k £81.77k £90.97k £124.57k £27.28k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 20 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
LETTERS DATED 28 SEPTEMBER 1987 AND 22 OCTOBER 1987.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ASSIST MEMBERS OF THE 4TH WEST LANCASHIRE OLD COMRADES' ASSOCIATION AND THEIR WIDOWS, WHO MAY BE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL HELP AND WITH THAT OBJECT IN VIEW, (B) TO ASSIST IN MAINTAINING CONTACT WITH MEMBERS OF THE 4TH WEST LANCASHIRE OLD COMRADES' ASSOCIATION AND THEIR WIDOWS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Registration history
  • 15 February 1988 : Standard registration
  • 21 February 2008 : Removed
  • 21 February 2008 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
RHQRA
Royal Artillery Barracks
Larkhill
SALISBURY
Wiltshire
SP4 8QT
Phone:
01980845528
Email:
No information available