Financial history CLERKENWELL CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity number: 210271
Charity reporting is up to date (105 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.03k £10.22k £10.21k £10.53k £10.56k
Total expenditure £31.72k £13.76k £7.04k £4.78k £5.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.42k N/A N/A N/A N/A