Financial history CPRE Norfolk

Charity Number: 210706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £50.49k £24.29k £51.87k £21.47k £29.26k
Total expenditure £39.28k £54.26k £63.40k £49.85k £58.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A