Trustees CPRE Norfolk

Charity Number: 210706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elliot James Griffiths Chair 23 October 2024
None on record
Nicholas John Sinclair Hancox BSc, LLM Trustee 25 April 2025
None on record
Lizette de Senna Fernandes Trustee 25 April 2025
None on record
Joe Peter Johnson Trustee 25 April 2025
None on record
Thomas Snowdon Trustee 22 January 2025
None on record
Lisa-Marie Ashbury Trustee 24 July 2024
None on record
Dr Pallavi Devulapalli Trustee 25 April 2022
None on record
Kevin Stephen Jones Trustee 19 July 2021
None on record
Mr George Ridgeway Trustee 06 July 2017
ATTLEBOROUGH HEALTH, CARE AND WELL-BEING TRUST
Received: 235 days late
CHRISTOPHER DADY Trustee 20 July 2015
None on record
DAVID HOOK Trustee
THE CHURCH AND TOWN ESTATES PROPERTY CHARITY
Received: On time
TOWN ESTATE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time