THE SOLDIERS, SAILORS, AIRMEN AND FAMILIES ASSOCIATION - FORCES HELP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIEVING THE NEED, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF THOSE SERVING OR HAVE SERVED IN THE ARMED FORCES AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS THROUGH - WELFARE ADVICE AND SUPPORT - HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE/WELFARE SERVICES - HOUSING -SPECIALIST SERVICES TO MEET UNMET NEEDS OF ARMED FORCES COMMUNITY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£34,120,000
Donations and legacies | £10.98m | |
Charitable activities | £18.18m | |
Other trading activities | £2.06m | |
Investments | £2.03m | |
Other | £867.00k |
Total expenditure:
£35,147,000
Raising funds | £4.45m | |
Charitable activities | £30.68m | |
Other | £25.00k |
-£2,108,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £6,150,000 from 2 government contract(s) and £617,000 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £4.47m | |
Charitable expenditure | £30.68m |
People

395 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
2500 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 7 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Brunei
- Canada
- Cyprus
- Falkland Islands
- France
- Germany
- Gibraltar
- Ireland
- Italy
- Nepal
- Northern Ireland
- Portugal
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 January 1963: Standard registration
- 01 April 1995: Removed
- S S A F A FORCES HELP (Working name)
- SSAFA (Working name)
- ssafa, the armed forces charity (Working name)
- SOLDIERS', SAILORS' AND AIRMEN'S FAMILIES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Angela Kathryn Holdsworth | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Edwin Keith Marriott | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|||||
SIR SIMON JOHN BOLLOM KBECBFREng | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Seal | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Pravinkumar Navekar | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Milner | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lady Alexandra Walmsley | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nick Baughan | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kate Pennell | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Charles Ness | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Evelyn Strouts | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Harley Athol ROWE | Trustee | 14 June 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.69m | £34.48m | £40.24m | £33.03m | £34.12m | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.93m | £32.89m | £29.74m | £34.42m | £35.15m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £14.89m | £8.80m | £6.41m | £6.42m | £6.15m | |
|
Income from government grants | £707.00k | £895.00k | £985.00k | £171.00k | £617.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £8.72m | £9.91m | £10.56m | £11.16m | £10.98m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.79m | £1.42m | £1.96m | £2.56m | £2.06m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £30.23m | £21.10m | £15.63m | £17.15m | £18.18m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.66m | £1.64m | £1.63m | £1.59m | £2.03m | |
|
Income - Other | £1.29m | £407.00k | £10.47m | £571.00k | £867.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £2.38m | £3.21m | £4.49m | £5.29m | £4.15m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £41.77m | £30.41m | £26.56m | £29.89m | £30.68m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.16m | £2.48m | £3.10m | £4.53m | £4.45m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £247.00k | £187.00k | £209.00k | £218.00k | £221.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £85.00k | £2.00k | £25.00k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £11.29m | £9.53m | £9.14m | £7.35m | £4.29m | |
|
Long-term investments | £34.81m | £38.35m | £42.92m | £39.89m | £39.89m | |
|
Other assets | £13.72m | £14.93m | £19.86m | £13.66m | £12.96m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.71m | -£17.09m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.35m | £3.85m | £8.87m | £4.15m | £3.60m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 26 JANUARY 1926 AS VARIED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 23 JUNE 1982, BY ORDERS IN COUNCIL DATED 27 OCTOBER 1993, 13 MARCH 1996, 19 DECEMBER 1996 AND 11 DECEMBER 2013. REVISED CHARTER DATED 1 JANUARY 2014.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEED, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF THE FOLLOWING INDIVIDUALS, WHO IN EACH CASE SHALL SATISFY SUCH REQUIREMENTS AS THE COUNCIL MAY FROM TIME TO TIME SPECIFY BY REGULATIONS: 1. MEMBERS AND FORMER MEMBERS OF ALL RANKS OF ALL BRANCHES OF OUR LAND SEA AND AIR FORCES (`BENEFICIARIES'); 2. ANY PERSON WHO IS DEPENDENT ON A BENEFICIARY; 3. ANY PERSON WHO WAS DEPENDENT ON A BENEFICIARY WHILE THAT BENEFICIARY WAS ALIVE; 4. ANY PERSON ON WHOM A BENEFICIARY IS DEPENDENT; AND 5. ANY PERSON ON WHOM A DECEASED BENEFICIARY WAS DEPENDENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Linked charities
- 22 January 1963 : Standard registration
- 01 April 1995 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
S S A F A
Queen Elizabeth House
4 St. Dunstan's Hill
London
EC3R 8AD
- Phone:
- 0800 260 6780
- Email:
- simon.blum@ssafa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window