LAWRENCE ATWELL'S CHARITY (SKINNERS' COMPANY)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides grants to individuals and institutions to promote educational and vocational opportunities for the disadvantaged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
Total income:
£575,198
Donations and legacies | £1.20k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £574.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£618,795
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £618.79k | |
Other | £0 |
-£264,109 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £618.79k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £416.73k | £930.12k | £462.88k | £522.35k | £575.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £589.72k | £603.89k | £577.24k | £565.96k | £618.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £412.94k | N/A | £17.19k | £1.20k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £517.14k | N/A | £504.16k | £574.00k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £603.89k | N/A | £565.96k | £618.79k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £9.62k | N/A | £23.41k | £25.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £316.52k | N/A | £302.40k | £339.07k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £15.80m | N/A | £18.20m | £17.44m | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £1.47m | N/A | £230.15k | £200.42k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £63.24k | N/A | £37.51k | £40.97k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 23RD SEPTEMBER 1988 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 11TH JANUARY 1991
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES ARE 1) IN OR TOWARDS THE COST OF A CELEBRATION BEARING THE NAME OF LAWRENCE ATWELL, WHICH MAY INCLUDE A DINNER, LUNCH OR RECEPTION, FOR REPRESENTATIVES OF THE COMPANY AND BENEFICIARIES OF THE CHARITY.2) IN PROVIDING ONE OR MORE SCHOLARSHIPS OR BURSARIES TO BE AWARDED TO A PUPIL OR PUPILS ATTENDING TONBRIDGE SCHOOL.3) IN ASSISTING YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND WHO ARE PREPARING FOR ENTERING UPON OR ENGAGED IN ANY PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE.4) IN MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO ANY CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR ORGANISATION.5) PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING, OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Linked charities
- BERTHA MORTON BEQUEST - JOHN MORTON EXHIBITION AWARD
- HENRY FISHER'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
- SIR JAMES LANCASTER FOR POOR SCHOLARS OF OXFORD AND CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITIES
- SIR THOMAS SMYTHE'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (NO1)
- THE A W ASTON COMMEMORATION TRUST
- THE ART MEMORIAL TRUST
- THE CHARITY OF EDWARD LEWIS
- THE GOAD BEQUEST
- THE LE JEUNE PRIZE
- THE M M WATSON BEQUEST
- WCB STAMP SCHOLARSHIP BEQUEST
- 21 September 1998 : Standard registration
- 01 October 2010 : Removed
- 01 October 2010 : Asset transfer out
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window