THE GUILD OF HEALTH AND ST RAPHAEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities of the charity have continued to be discussions and the dissemination of literature, prayer meditation and intercessions. The charity has also continued to increase its work in the country by promoting conferences and retreats.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 25 October 2022: Funds received from 1072486 THE INNER WHEEL CLUB OF EGREMONT BENEVOLENT FUND
- THE GUILD OF HEALTH LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Peter Rodney Clark | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev ELEANOR JANE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Nicola Charles Burr | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Steven Jeffrey Coles | Trustee | 30 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Victoria Showunmi | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Catherine Ann Nelson | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Ken Herbert | Trustee | 04 December 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr David Ernest McDonald | Trustee | 13 October 2014 |
|
|||||||||||
Dr MICHAEL PLATT | Trustee | 09 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.23k | £51.44k | £49.00k | £63.87k | £57.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £121.09k | £116.18k | £122.00k | £137.88k | £150.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 March 2023 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 March 2023 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/10/1950 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/07/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06/07/2015 as amended on 11 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
1. TO BRING TOGETHER CHRISTIAN PEOPLE, INCLUDING DOCTORS, PSYCHOLOGISTS AND MINISTERS OF RELIGION, TO WORK IN FELLOWSHIP FOR FULLER HEALTH, BOTH FOR THE INDIVIDUAL AND THE COMMUNITY. 2 TO ENABLE ALL MEMBERS TO STUDY THE INTER-ACTION BETWEEN PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL FACTORS IN WELL BEING. 3 TO SUSTAIN AND STRENGTHEN BY PRAYER THE SICK, THOSE WHO MINISTER TO THEM, AND ALL THOSE WHO EXERCISE THE DIVINE GIFT OF HEALING. 4 TO HELP MEN AND WOMEN TO REALISE IN THEMSELVES, AS MEMBERS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAMILY, THE ABUNDANT LIFE OFFERED BY CHRIST.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brookes Stephens
New Media House
Davidson Rd
Lichfield
Staffs
WS14 9DZ
- Phone:
- 07398164477
- Email:
- director@gohealth.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window