Financial history FIFTEEN HOUSES

Charity number: 211074
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £19.69k £20.88k £20.79k £20.07k £19.40k
Total expenditure £18.93k £11.53k £161.15k £11.25k £13.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £765 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A