ARMENIAN CHURCH OF ST SARKIS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity (as landlord) is responsible for providing the premises of the Armenian Church of St Sarkis, Iverna Gardens, Kensington and church hall to the St Sarkis Parish Council and the adjacent vicarage as residential accommodation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 01 November 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVE SETRAK MOURADIAN | Chair | 18 May 2011 |
|
|
||||||
Hovan Torosyan | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|||||||
Alexander Adamov | Trustee | 21 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Armen Der Hakobian | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|||||||
Olivier Djololian | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|||||||
Yuri Khodjamirian CFA | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Sarkis George Kurkjian FCSI | Trustee | 01 January 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.79k | £91.02k | £104.17k | £140.41k | £177.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.18k | £108.47k | £114.67k | £188.14k | £270.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £28.57k | £32.27k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8TH JANUARY 1923 & CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION DATED 2 AUGUST 2000.
Charitable objects
TO PERMIT THE CHURCH TO BE USED OCCUPIED AND ENJOYED AS A PLACE OF PUBLIC WORSHIP BY MEMBERS OF THE ARMENIAN CHURCH IN ENGLAND AND FOR A RESIDENCE FOR THE CLERGYMAN AND HIS FAMILY.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF KENSINGTON AND CHELSEA
Contact information
- Address:
-
ARMENIAN VICARAGE
IVERNA GARDENS
LONDON
W8 6TP
- Phone:
- 02079370152
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window