FRIENDS OF TEWKESBURY ABBEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the Friends of Tewkesbury Abbey is to assist in maintaining the fabric of the Abbey, and its services and activities, and adorning it and preserving it, together with its furnishings, vestments and ornaments, for posterity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 19 September 1962: Standard registration
- 03 September 2015: Funds received from 288111 THE TEWKESBURY ABBEY FLOODLIGHTING TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM LESLIE FINCH | Chair | 06 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Christopher Bennett | Trustee | 03 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr James Bennett Lancelot | Trustee | 03 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Nancy Gwendoline Oakes | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Rafael Fernandes-Bellairs | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Edith Mary Davis | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH COULTON | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hugh McMurdo SWEET | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Kathryn Parsons | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Parkes | Trustee | 07 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Lancelot | Trustee | 07 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian John White | Trustee | 07 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Elizabeth Raywood | Trustee | 02 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Rev Charles Whitney | Trustee | 02 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Janice Smail | Trustee | 05 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CHRISTOPHER EVANS | Trustee | 06 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANDREW NICHOLAS CROWTHER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.01k | £96.10k | £85.01k | £58.06k | £56.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £204.15k | £112.10k | £150.38k | £177.13k | £101.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION
Charitable objects
1. TO ASSIST IN THE CARING FOR AND ADORNING OF TEWKESBURY ABBEY AND ITS PRESERVATION TOGETHER WITH ITS GOODS AND ORNAMENTS FOR POSTERITY. 2. THE PRESERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF TWO ANCIENT MONASTIC PROPERTIES VESTED IN THE ABBEY HOUSE TRUST AND ABBEY LAWN TRUST.
Area of benefit
TEWKESBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tewkesbury Abbey Office
Church Street
Tewkesbury
GL20 5RZ
- Phone:
- 01684850959
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window