THE CHURCH LANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing funds for the upkeep and maintenance of the Parish Churches of St Peters, St Lukes and St Pauls
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income:
£828,837
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £828.84k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£741,036
Raising funds | £265.42k | |
Charitable activities | £466.76k | |
Other | £8.86k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £274.28k | |
Charitable expenditure | £466.76k | |
Retained for future use | £87.80k |
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 21 November 1962: Standard registration
- 26 June 1993: Removed
- THE CHURCH LANDS CHARITY (Working name)
- ST ALBANS CHURCH LANDS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Malcolm Olver | Chair | 02 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Juliet Coady | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Alexander Neal Hall | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Mark Garside | Trustee | 31 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev MARK DEARNLEY | Trustee | 30 November 2015 |
|
|||||
MARK WALLER | Trustee |
|
||||||
PETER KASER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £641.09k | £671.32k | £708.89k | £1.00m | £828.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £710.90k | £630.44k | £534.57k | £738.46k | £741.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £641.09k | £671.32k | £708.89k | £1.00m | £828.84k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £315.00k | £380.00k | £335.00k | £440.00k | £466.76k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £389.27k | £230.86k | £184.80k | £277.08k | £265.42k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.63k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £9.26k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £380.00k | £335.00k | £440.00k | £457.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £6.63k | £19.57k | £14.77k | £21.38k | £8.86k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £14.53m | £15.40m | £16.32m | £12.65m | £12.65m | |
|
Other assets | £526.04k | £493.67k | £533.15k | £790.93k | £898.60k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £167.22k | £93.96k | £104.65k | £98.94k | £118.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 December 2022 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 December 2022 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 December 2022 | 396 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 December 2022 | 396 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 6 JUNE 1995
Charitable objects
(1) IN OR TOWARDS THE UPKEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCHES OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES OF ST PETER ST ALBANS ST PAUL ST ALBANS AND ST LUKE ST ALBANS WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THE SAID PARISH CHURCH OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER ST ALBANS. (2) FOR FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN ANY OR ALL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF ST PETER, ST LUKES AND ST PAUL, ST ALBANS
Linked charities
- 21 November 1962 : Standard registration
- 26 June 1993 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Collinson Hall
9-11 Victoria Street
ST. ALBANS
AL1 3UB
- Phone:
- 01727 843 222
- Email:
- ACCOUNTS@COLLINSONHALL.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window