Financial history BELCHAMP ST PAUL AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY HOUSE

Charity number: 211460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £25.63k £40.66k £22.87k £18.11k £14.85k
Total expenditure £10.55k £17.75k £73.53k £65.78k £8.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.41k £19.21k £3.05k £3.27k N/A