TOYNBEE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a multi-purpose charity working to eradicate poverty and disadvantage. We deliver a range of community services in advice, financial inclusion, learning and wellbeing. We share our experience of local action to influence national policy. We are also a residential community, conference and venue hire centre. More information can be found at www.toynbeehall.org.uk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£7,777,000
Donations and legacies | £188.00k | |
Charitable activities | £6.61m | |
Other trading activities | £410.00k | |
Investments | £439.00k | |
Other | £127.00k |
Total expenditure:
£8,002,000
Raising funds | £919.00k | |
Charitable activities | £7.08m | |
Other | £0 |
£2,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £857,000 from 2 government contract(s) and £128,000 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £919.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.08m |
People

89 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 04 December 1962: Standard registration
- 24 August 2004: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- TOYNBEE HALL (Working name)
- THE UNIVERSITIES SETTLEMENT IN EAST LONDON (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN ERIC BURNS | Chair | 23 March 2022 |
|
|||||||
Adedamola Adedayo Olaleye | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Claire Anne Collins | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Liam Jonathan Patrick Keogh | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Yu-Shan Chiu | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Thomas Nowacki | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|||||||
Alice Gac | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Samuel Joseph Thomas | Trustee | 21 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.89m | £8.92m | £9.19m | £8.57m | £7.78m | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.00m | £8.48m | £9.20m | £9.00m | £8.00m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £843.00k | £883.00k | £920.00k | £843.00k | £857.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £410.00k | £201.00k | £258.00k | £331.00k | £128.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £845.00k | £573.00k | £301.00k | £159.00k | £188.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £401.00k | £49.00k | £274.00k | £440.00k | £410.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £6.42m | £7.78m | £8.07m | £7.37m | £6.61m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £165.00k | £367.00k | £441.00k | £446.00k | £439.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £65.00k | £151.00k | £97.00k | £152.00k | £127.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.22m | £7.99m | £8.56m | £8.25m | £7.08m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £777.00k | £491.00k | £640.00k | £743.00k | £919.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £119.00k | £132.00k | £110.00k | £198.00k | £198.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £3.37m | £2.89m | £2.78m | £2.07m | £1.93m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £9.45m | £9.30m | £9.32m | £9.09m | £9.10m | |
|
Long-term investments | £7.21m | £7.28m | £7.29m | £6.25m | £6.25m | |
|
Other assets | £1.92m | £2.97m | £2.62m | £2.13m | £1.39m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.94m | £5.42m | £5.10m | £4.81m | £4.30m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION 21/071884, AMENDED 09/06/1890, 08/04/1895, CONFIRMED 07/07/1890, 06/05/1895 AND 22/10/1963, AS AMENDED 09/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21/01/2016 REGISTERED WITH COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/01/2016
Charitable objects
1 TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP: 1.1 BY PROVIDING GOODS, SERVICES AND/OR ADVICE TO PERSONS WHO SUFFER FROM HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, INCLUDING BY VIRTUE OF THEIR HEALTH, AGE, OFFENDING STATUS, ECONOMIC OR OTHER SPECIAL CIRCUMSTANCES; 1.2 BY UNDERTAKING AND SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO FACTORS THAT CONTRIBUTE TO POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND THE MOST APPROPRIATE WAYS TO MITIGATE THESE; AND 1.3 BY RAISING AWARENESS AND INFORMING AND INFLUENCING THE PUBLIC AND PUBLIC POLICY ON THESE ISSUES; 2 TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, BY UNDERTAKING AND SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO FACTORS THAT CONTRIBUTE TO SOCIAL EXCLUSION AND THE MOST APPROPRIATE WAYS TO MITIGATE IT AND BY RAISING AWARENESS AND INFORMING AND INFLUENCING THE PUBLIC AND PUBLIC POLICY ON SOCIAL EXCLUSION; 3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EXPERIENCES, LEARNING AND ENGAGEMENT, ENHANCING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, AMONGST OTHER THINGS, LIFELONG LEARNING AND CITIZENSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; 4 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCING, SINGING AND MUSIC; 5 TO PROVIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL ENVIRONMENT BY THE PRESERVATION, REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF THE HISTORIC BUILDING KNOWN AS TOYNBEE HALL SITUATED AT 28 COMMERCIAL STREET, LONDON E1 6LS; AND/OR 6 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND/OR INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 04 December 1962 : Standard registration
- 24 August 2004 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
TOYNBEE HALL
28 COMMERCIAL STREET
LONDON
E1 6LS
- Phone:
- 02073922984
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window