SMALL CHURCH CHARITIES

Charity number: 212127
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Preacher's Charity: apply 2/3rd's of cleared income for the benefit of the Dean & Chapter of Norwich Cathedral, the remaining 1/3rd to be made available for the benefit of inhabitants of the city of Norwich.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £16,223
Total expenditure: £19,971

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 November 1962: Standard registration
  • 16 September 1994: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PREACHERS CHARITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Arthur Banham Chair 01 April 2016
GREAT HOSPITAL
Received: On time
SIR PETER SEAMAN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Dr Timothy John Pestell Trustee 28 February 2024
SIR PETER SEAMAN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
GREAT HOSPITAL
Received: On time
Niul Dillon Hatcher Trustee 28 February 2024
SIR PETER SEAMAN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
GREAT HOSPITAL
Received: On time
THE ANTEROS ARTS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Kevin John Revell Trustee 09 June 2021
ACTIVE NORFOLK FOUNDATION
Recently registered
GREAT HOSPITAL
Received: On time
SIR PETER SEAMAN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Andrew James Yuill Trustee 06 December 2019
SPORTS FACTORY
Recently registered
GREAT HOSPITAL
Received: On time
SIR PETER SEAMAN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Francis Norman Davey Trustee 20 September 2019
GREAT HOSPITAL
Received: On time
SIR PETER SEAMAN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Gill Audrey Westwood Trustee 15 February 2019
GREAT HOSPITAL
Received: On time
SIR PETER SEAMAN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Dr Clare Singh Trustee 01 June 2016
GREAT HOSPITAL
Received: On time
SIR PETER SEAMAN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Jonathan Paul Stanley Trustee 26 September 2011
SIR PETER SEAMAN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
GREAT HOSPITAL
Received: On time
Catherine Jeffries Trustee 01 April 2005
GREAT HOSPITAL
Received: On time
SIR PETER SEAMAN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, EATON, NORWICH
Received: On time
MR JOHN WALKER Trustee 01 April 2005
GREAT HOSPITAL
Received: On time
SIR PETER SEAMAN'S CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.56k £15.91k £15.54k £17.60k £16.22k
Total expenditure £22.39k £16.12k £14.85k £17.20k £19.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 10 MARCH 1896 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 06/01/1931, 15/03/1932 AND 06/09/1932
Charitable objects
INCOME FOR SERMONS TO BE PREACHED ON 17TH MAY TO EXCITE CHARITIES AND GOOD WORKS IN THE CHURCH OF ST. JOHN DE SEPULCHRE, NORWICH AND AT GARVESTON AND WHINBURGH, NORFOLK.
Area of benefit
CITY OF NORWICH
Registration history
  • 15 November 1962 : Standard registration
  • 16 September 1994 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
GREAT HOSPITAL
BISHOPGATE
NORWICH
NR1 4EL
Phone:
01603622022
Website:

No information available