GILBERT MURRAY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust makes grants and awards to promote the understanding of classical Greek language and and culture and the study of the purposes and work of the United Nations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 January 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Louisa Jenkins | Chair | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof Andrew Donald Morrison | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Katherine Harloe | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
DR MARY ROSE WYLES | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof Phillip Horky | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gabriel Bodard | Trustee | 17 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jeremy Larkins | Trustee | 17 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma Bridges | Trustee | 12 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Richard Alston | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Professor Edward Keene | Trustee | 07 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Wilson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Professor FIONA MACINTOSH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR MIKE EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR MICHAEL BURNEY TRAPP MA DPHIL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.39k | £14.37k | £6.70k | £14.70k | £40.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.21k | £4.25k | £8.68k | £9.36k | £8.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11TH APRIL 1956
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF ANCIENT GREEK LITERATURE AND THOUGHT AND THE PROPAGATION OF HELLENIC CULTURE; (B) TO PROMOTE WITH THE HELP OF TRAVELLING FELLOWSHIPS, SCHOLARSHIPS, GRANTS OR OTHER MEANS OF THE STUDY OF THE PURPOSES AND WORK OF THE UNITED NATIONS; (C) TO TAKE SUCH ACTION AS THEY MAY THINK FIT FOR THE COLLECTION OF FURTHER FUNDS TO CARRY OUT THE PURPOSES SET OUT IN 2(A) AND 2(B) ABOVE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o The Hellenic Society
Senate House
Malet Street
LONDON
WC1E 7HU
- Phone:
- 07786543925
- Email:
- emma.bridges@open.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window