Financial history RICHARD WALFORD'S CHARITY

Charity Number: 212466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £517 £575 £559 £1.19k £10.55k
Total expenditure £500 £500 £500 £550 £600
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A