THE ANGLO CHILEAN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In order to raise funds for its charitable activities in the UK and Chile, the society organises events such as lectures, concerts, wine tastings and visits to intereting locations as well as holding an annual dinner or reception to mark Chile's national day on 18 September, a Christmas party and an asado al palo.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of Westminster
- Chile
Governance
- 03 February 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Jennifer Clouder Richards | Chair | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Wyndham Sterland | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jose Perez | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claudia Iglesias Acuna Dempster | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Guiermo Claudio Duran | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marcos Dario Stuardo Concha | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fabiana Jaramillo | Trustee | 26 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Catalina Herrera | Trustee | 26 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
MAGDALENA JONES | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter West | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MONICA VOLPIN | Trustee | 23 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
CARMEN LIBERA PEARSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT NORMAN HART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALASDAIR GRANT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.41k | £21.55k | £27.93k | £39.38k | £23.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.28k | £16.91k | £20.90k | £41.15k | £20.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 05 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES APPROVED 6 JANUARY 1966 AS AMENDED 27 FEBRUARY 1992, 6 MAY 1997 AND 14 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PEOPLE OF GREAT BRITAIN CONCERNING CHILE, ITS PEOPLE, HISTORY, LANGUAGE AND LITERATURE, ITS INSTITUTIONS, FOLKLORE AND CULTURE, AND ITS ITELLECTUAL, ARTISTIC AND ECONOMIC LIFE, AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT - I) TO MAINTAIN LIBRARIES AND ISSUE PUBLICATIONS, BOTH IN ENGLISH AND IN SPANISH. II) TO ORGANISE AND PRESENT FILM SHOWS, ART EXHIBITIONS, CONFERENCES, CLASSES, LECTURES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES. III) TO GIVE ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO SUCH EDUCATION, INCLUDING THE ORGANISING OF PRIZE ESSAY COMPETITIONS IN SCHOOLS ON SUBJECTS RELATING TO CHILE; AND WHERE APPROPRIATE; TO MAKE GRANTS AT SCHOOLS, UNIVERSITIES OR OTHER RECOGNISED EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS.
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Embassy Of Chile
37-41 Old Queen Street
LONDON
SW1H 9JA
- Phone:
- 07779635892
- Email:
- info@anglochileansociety.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window