Financial history ROYAL COLLEGE OF SURGEONS OF ENGLAND

Charity number: 212808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £26.71m £26.92m £28.08m £33.55m £35.13m
Total expenditure £28.96m £29.57m £34.45m £36.11m £35.22m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.82m £4.94m £5.31m £5.94m £5.66m
Income - Other trading activities £311.00k £199.00k £363.00k £1.10m £1.33m
Income - Charitable activities £19.63m £21.18m £21.72m £24.92m £26.57m
Income - Endowments £0 £6.00k £475.00k £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.95m £601.00k £692.00k £1.58m £1.57m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £734.00k £301.00k £838.00k £885.00k £606.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £25.49m £24.61m £26.87m £30.09m £33.48m
Expenditure - Raising funds £691.00k £928.00k £1.02m £1.04m £885.00k
Expenditure - Governance £564.00k £531.00k £752.00k £1.32m £1.32m
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £290.00k £391.00k £433.00k £385.00k £448.00k
Expenditure - Other £2.79m £4.03m £6.56m £4.98m £853.00k