THE AIR PILOTS BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty of persons who are or have been engaged professionally as air pilots or air navigators and who are British subjects by birth or by naturalisation or who are liverymen, upper freemen or freemen of the Guild of Air Pilots and Air Navigators of London. The relief of poverty and/or advancement of education of the dependants widows and orphans of all such persons mentioned above.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Akrotiri
- Australia
- Canada
- Cyprus
- Dhekelia
- Falkland Islands
- Gibraltar
- Guernsey
- Hong Kong
- Isle Of Man
- Jersey
- Malta
- New Zealand
- Qatar
- Scotland
- Singapore
- South Africa
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 12 December 1962: Standard registration
- THE GUILD OF AIR PILOTS BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Anthony Denyer | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cdr Mark Christopher Walker | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Ferrier Trasler | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lt Col Ian Henry Murning | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Melia MA FCA VR | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Captain Adrian Joseph Robert Keenan | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAPTAIN CHRISTINE ANN McGEE | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CHARLES PIPER | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAUL JOSEPH TACON BA ACIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.92k | £34.22k | £27.97k | £41.51k | £275.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.55k | £24.73k | £35.88k | £49.58k | £50.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 23 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 23 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 19/05/2003 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09/04/2014
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN ENGAGED PROFESSIONALLY AS AIR PILOTS OR AIR NAVIGATORS IN COMMERCIAL AVIATION AND WHO ARE BRITISH SUBJECTS BY BIRTH OR BY NATURALISATION OR WHO ARE LIVERYMEN, UPPER FREEMAN OR FREEMEN OF THE GUILD OF AIR PILOTS AND AIR NAVIGATORS OF LONDON. (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND/OR ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE DEPENDANTS WIDOWS AND ORPHANS OF ALL SUCH PERSONS AS MENTIONED IN (A). INSOFAR AS THE INCOME AND CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY CANNOT BE APPLIED TOWARDS OBJECTS (A) AND (B) ABOVE IT MAY BE APPLIED IN SUPPORTING SUCH CHARITIES ESTABLISHED WHOLLY FOR PURPOSES IN THE FIELD OF AVIATION OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH AVIATION AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Honourable Company Of Air Pilots
52A Borough High Street
LONDON
SE1 1XN
- Phone:
- 02074044032
- Email:
- office@airpilots.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window