THE CENTRAL YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CENTRAL YMCA IS ONE OF THE WORLD'S OLDEST AND LARGEST CHARITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE. WE HELP MAKE LIVES HAPPIER, HEALTHIER AND MORE FULFILLED THROUGH A UNIQUE BLEND OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, ADVOCACY, AND SUPPORT. ALL OF OUR WORK GOES TOWARDS HELPING TO GIVE PEOPLE ACCESS TO LIFE-CHANGING OPPORTUNITIES NATIONWIDE THROUGH OUR FOUR OPERATIONS; YMCA TRAINING, YMCA AWARDS, YMCAFIT, AND YMCA CLUB.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£10,574,635
Donations and legacies | £179.32k | |
Charitable activities | £9.97m | |
Other trading activities | £398.27k | |
Investments | £29.18k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£18,405,844
Raising funds | £214.56k | |
Charitable activities | £15.64m | |
Other | £2.55m |
£245,049 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £5,422,849 from 7 government contract(s) and £12,500 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.76m | |
Charitable expenditure | £15.64m |
People

246 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 December 1963: Standard registration
- CENTRAL YMCA (Working name)
- Y TOURING (Working name)
- YMCA QUALIFICATIONS (Working name)
- THE CENTRAL YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION (COMMONLY KNOWN AS THE LONDON CENTRAL YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION) (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Anthony Beal | Chair | 19 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carol Snape | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Kelly | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
ADAM STUART WHALE | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Eliza Bryant | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yusuf Nurbhai | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Stephen Guatam Varma | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter William Wright | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ian John Govendir | Trustee | 19 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Lissimore | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Marie Smith | Trustee | 22 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.72m | £10.81m | £9.50m | £8.97m | £10.57m | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.85m | £13.36m | £12.76m | £13.37m | £18.41m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £6.61m | £7.74m | £5.20m | £4.28m | £5.42m | |
|
Income from government grants | £28.00k | £22.00k | £47.00k | £13.00k | £12.50k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £33.00k | £46.00k | £9.00k | £130.00k | £179.32k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £333.00k | £67.00k | £274.00k | £445.00k | £398.27k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £10.62m | £9.85m | £9.12m | £8.32m | £9.97m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £233.00k | £183.00k | £95.00k | £44.00k | £29.18k | |
|
Income - Other | £504.00k | £661.00k | £7.00k | £36.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £5.00k | £9.00k | £0 | £0 | £62.27k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £14.28m | £12.86m | £12.37m | £13.16m | £15.64m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £381.00k | £203.00k | £202.00k | £211.00k | £214.56k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £140.00k | £127.00k | £146.00k | £166.00k | £287.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £82.00k | £153.00k | £126.00k | £117.00k | £111.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £187.00k | £298.00k | £187.00k | £0 | £2.55m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £18.90m | £17.74m | £17.47m | £13.14m | £1.38m | |
|
Long-term investments | £8.99m | £10.79m | £8.92m | £5.67m | £3.77m | |
|
Other assets | £3.12m | £3.53m | £1.85m | £4.30m | £5.96m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £6.71m | £8.06m | £8.00m | £7.44m | £3.03m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/12/1911 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/03/1950 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/03/1971 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/09/1975 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/12/1978 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/04/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/12/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/10/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/06/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 JUL 2017 as amended on 28 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
2 THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SPIRITUAL, SOCIAL, INTELLECTUAL AND PHYSICAL CONDITION OF PRINCIPALLY YOUNG MEN AND WOMEN (BUT WITHOUT ANY SPECIFIC RESTRICTION AS TO AGE) 2.1 THE ACTIVITIES OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE IN ACCORDANCE WITH AND BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CONSISTENT WITH THE BASIS OF ALLIANCE OF THE YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATIONS IN VARIOUS COUNTRIES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD WHICH WAS ADOPTED AT THE GENERAL CONFERENCE OF DELEGATES FROM THE ASSOCIATIONS OF EUROPE AND AMERICA HELD IN PARIS IN AUGUST 1955, AND EXPRESSED IN THE FOLLOWING TERMS, NAMELY:- "THE YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATIONS SEEK TO UNITE THOSE YOUNG MEN WHO, REGARDING THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AS THEIR GOD AND SAVIOUR, ACCORDING TO THE HOLY SCRIPTURES, DESIRE TO BE HIS DISCIPLES IN THEIR DOCTRINE AND IN THEIR LIFE AND TO ASSOCIATE THEIR EFFORTS FOR THE EXTENSION OF HIS KINGDOM AMONG YOUNG MEN” AND WITH ANY OTHER STATEMENTS ACCEPTED BY THE YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATIONS MOVEMENT NATIONALLY OR INTERNATIONALLY WHICH SHALL CONVEY THE INTENTION TO MAINTAIN THE CHRISTIAN PURPOSE OF THE ASSOCIATION INCLUDING THE FOLLOWING STATEMENT OF AIMS AND PURPOSES ADOPTED BY THE YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATIONS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM IN SEPTEMBER 1971, NAMELY:- "THE YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION IS A CHRISTIAN MOVEMENT. AT ITS CENTRE ARE CHRISTIANS WHO, REGARDING JESUS CHRIST AS LORD AND SAVIOUR, DESIRE TO SHARE THEIR FAITH WITH OTHERS AND MAKE HIM KNOWN, BELIEVED, TRUSTED, LOVED, SERVED AND EXEMPLIFIED IN ALL HUMAN RELATIONSHIPS. IT WELCOMES INTO ITS FELLOWSHIP PERSONS OF OTHER RELIGIOUS FAITHS AND OF NONE. ACCORDINGLY THE YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION STANDS FOR: (A) A WORLDWIDE FELLOWSHIP BASED ON THE EQUAL VALUE OF ALL PERSONS. (B) RESPECT AND FREEDOM FOR ALL, TOLERANCE AND UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE OF DIFFERENT OPINIONS. (C) ACTIVE CONCERN FOR THE NEEDS OF THE COMMUNITY. (D) UNITED EFFORT BY CHRISTIANS OF DIFFERENT TRADITIONS AND THOSE OF OTHER FAITHS OR NONE. 2.2 THE YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION AIMS TO: (I) PROVIDE A WELCOME TO MEMBERS AND BENEFICIARIES FOR THEMSELVES, IN A MEETING PLACE WHICH IS THEIRS TO SHARE, WHERE FRIENDSHIP CAN BE MADE AND COUNSEL SOUGHT. (II) DEVELOP ACTIVITIES WHICH STIMULATE AND CHALLENGE ITS MEMBERS AND BENEFICIARIES IN AN ENVIRONMENT THAT ENABLES THEM TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY AND FIND A SENSE OF ACHIEVEMENT. (III) INVOLVE ALL MEMBERS IN CARE AND WORK FOR OTHERS. (IV) CREATE OPPORTUNITIES FOR EXCHANGING VIEWS, SO THAT ITS MEMBERS CAN IMPROVE THEIR UNDERSTANDING OF THE WORLD, OF THEMSELVES AND OF ONE ANOTHER. (V) RELIEVE OR ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF PERSONS OF ALL AGES WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL, PHYSICAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
LONDON AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Central YMCA
120 Cromer Street
LONDON
WC1H 8BS
- Phone:
- 020 3994 9544
- Email:
- info@ymca.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window