THE WEST MIDLAND BIRD CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the conservation of wild birds and their habitats and educate the public in the knowledge, understanding and appreciation of wild birds and wild bird study.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,947 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
- Wolverhampton
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 19 May 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER CLIVE BROADBENT | Chair | 09 November 2016 |
|
|||||||
Donald Brian Frederick Ainsworth | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|||||||
Colin McShane | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|||||||
Timothy John Fallowell | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|||||||
RICHARD NEIL STONIER | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|||||||
John Kenneth Macmillan | Trustee | 31 October 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.78k | £138.77k | £128.11k | £94.03k | £109.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.46k | £91.70k | £81.12k | £90.54k | £95.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 November 2020 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 November 2020 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 06 MAR 1962 AS AMENDED ON 02 JAN 1981 AS AMENDED ON 10 MAY 2023
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING, AND APPRECIATION OF WILD BIRDS AND WILD BIRD STUDY, AND 2. TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION OF, AND RAISE PUBLIC AND SCIENTIFIC AWARENESS OF, WILD BIRDS AND THEIR HABITATS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE, WARWICKSHIRE, WOCESTERSHIRE, STAFFORDSHIRE AND WEST MIDLANDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Deans Accountants
Gibson House
Hurricane Court
Hurricane Close
Stafford
ST16 1GZ
- Phone:
- 07447 040504
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window