Financial history ROYAL PHILHARMONIC SOCIETY

Charity Number: 213693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £503.92k £775.26k £391.77k £840.69k £293.58k
Total expenditure £444.32k £614.67k £537.28k £524.61k £458.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £320.56k £352.60k N/A £674.37k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £146.11k £393.16k N/A £88.49k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment £32.82k £23.92k N/A £74.36k N/A
Income - Other £4.43k £5.58k N/A £3.48k N/A
Income - Legacies £210.00k £275.44k N/A £502.01k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £404.99k £579.50k N/A £492.31k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £39.33k £35.17k N/A £32.30k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £4.25k £4.47k N/A £4.76k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £67.50k N/A £47.50k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £18.81k N/A £3.93k N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A