THE W R V S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's main activity is to receive and subsequently distribute legacies on behalf of other Charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 April 1968: Standard registration
- 31 March 1992: Removed
- W R V S TRUSTEES LTD (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DALLAS POUNDS | Chair | 19 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Maria Brigid Townson | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 May 2023 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22.9.1953 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 9 APRIL 1963, 25 MAY 1967 AND 8TH MAY 1997 AND A DEED OF APPOINTMENT OF NEW TRUSTEES DATED 5TH FEBRUARY 2003
Charitable objects
(1) THE PROVISION OF PREMISES FOR FAMILY CENTRES, DAY CLUBS FOR THE ELDERLY AND HOLIDAY FACILITIES FOR THE NEEDY (2) RESIDENTIAL CARE CLUBS FOR PERSONS OVER THE AGE OF 65, WHO ARE NO LONGER IN A POSITION TO LOOK AFTER THEMSELVES (3) THE ADMINISTRATION OF PROPERTY AND INVESTMENT FUNDS ON BEHALF OF THE WRVS AND OTHER CHARITABLE TRUSTS VESTED IN WRVS TRUSTEES LIMITED (4) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE WRVS TRUSTEES MAY SELECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 17 April 1968 : Standard registration
- 31 March 1992 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
The WRVS Trust
c/o Greensleeves Homes Trust
138 Cheapside
London
EC2V 6BJ
- Phone:
- 02077931122
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window