WORTHING MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support people with learning disabilities, their families and carers. Run an information centre, cafe and charity shop providing work experience to people with learning disabilities. Run various clubs including a retirement club, a carers group and a club for young people with Aspergers Syndrome.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £93,794 from 3 government contract(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Sussex
Governance
- 02 August 1964: Standard registration
- WORTHING MENCAP (Working name)
- WORTHING AND DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AND ADULTS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Mary Crockett | Chair |
|
||||||||
Cara Croke | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|||||||
LISA DONLEVY | Trustee | 26 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTINE NEWTON | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
Tracey Trangmar | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
Shireen Hannam | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
JANET WILLIAMSON | Trustee | 19 March 2016 |
|
|||||||
RONA PATRICIA DENIESE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ANN BOUGHTON-LEIGH | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DAVID ALLISON SMITH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £179.27k | £247.85k | £279.36k | £267.96k | £330.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £184.40k | £215.33k | £242.14k | £249.63k | £307.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £37.11k | £51.66k | £56.55k | £48.88k | £93.79k | |
|
Income from government grants | £28.85k | £68.69k | £56.55k | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED APRIL 1958 AS AMENDED 25TH APRIL 1964, 30TH APRIL 1980 AND 18TH FEBRUARY 2003 AS AMENDED ON 15 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY ARE: (A) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS AND TO PROMOTE A BETTER PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING AND THEREBY GREATER OPPORTUNITY FOR THOSE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND DISABILITIES IN WORTHING AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. (B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. “LEARNING DISABILITY" MEANS ANY DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITY OF THE MIND AND ANY ASSOCIATED CONDITION HOWSOEVER CAUSED AND WHETHER MILD, MODERATE OR SEVERE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE WORTHING AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Buddys Worthing Mencap
121 South Farm Road
WORTHING
West Sussex
BN14 7AX
- Phone:
- 01903 202030
- Email:
- buddys@worthingmencap.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window