CHARITIES ICW CHRISTCHURCH, BEDFORD ROAD, HITCHIN

Charity number: 214400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Income from the charities involved, in connection with Christchurch, Hitchin, Hertfordshire, is distributed as required by the scheme to: 1. The minister, for his own use. 2. Christchurch, to help maintain religious worship. 3. Poorer members, or ones with particular needs.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £589
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 August 1963: Standard registration
  • 20 May 1997: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CHARITIES OF ELIZABETH SIMPSON - ELIZABETH HAILEY AND OTHERS - CHRISTCHURCH HITCHIN U R C CHARITIES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Vivien Dent Trustee 20 May 2024
None on record
Alex Dent Trustee 20 May 2024
None on record
Julie Mills Trustee 20 May 2024
None on record
Mark Richardson Trustee 20 May 2024
None on record
ANDREW WILLIAM MILLS Trustee 26 January 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £549 £561 £571 £587 £589
Total expenditure £549 £561 £571 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 April 2023 176 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 20 AUGUST 1974
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE CLEAR INCOME AND AT THEIR DISCRETION THE PROPERTY IN MAINTAINING THE RELIGIOUS WORSHIP OF THE CONGREGATION MEETING AT CHRISTCHURCH, BEDFORD ROAD, HITCHIN.
Area of benefit
HITCHIN
Registration history
  • 19 August 1963 : Standard registration
  • 20 May 1997 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
12 Kardwell Close
HITCHIN
Hertfordshire
SG4 9LJ
Phone:
07921781115
Website:

No information available