Financial history JOHN SUGARS ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity Number: 214681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £29.00k £29.60k £30.00k £26.52k £30.51k
Total expenditure £32.00k £24.40k £26.00k £41.91k £29.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A