Governing document JOHN SUGARS ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Charity number: 214681

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 19 NOVEMBER 1907 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 2 JUNE 1939, 1 OCTOBER 1940 AND 21 APRIL 1961 AND SCHEME OF 19 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR SIX POOR WIDOWS OF NOT LESS THAN 55 YEARS OF AGE AND OF GOOD CHARACTER.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
FORMER ANCIENT PARISH OF ALL SAINTS SOUTH LYNN
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.