ALL SAINTS CHURCH LANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of All Saints almspeople and for the purpose of furthering the work of the Church Of England in the archdeaconry of Bristol. The maintenance of All Saints Church, Bristol.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 04 November 1963: Standard registration
- CHURCH LANDS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER CLIVE METCALFE | Chair |
|
||||||
Peter Westbury | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Timothy Simon Jenkinson | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Rev Richard Norman Pendlebury | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Rev Nicola Francis Harris | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane Margaret Woolf | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Durie | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
PETER EDWARD WOOLF | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £152.74k | £152.17k | £125.46k | £157.62k | £148.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.62k | £140.15k | £162.63k | £153.16k | £475.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARITY COMMISSION SCHEME OF THE 11TH AUGUST 1978 AS VARIED OR AFFECTED BY FURTHER SCHEMES OF THE COMMISSIONERS OF 15TH DECEMBER 1987,AND 19TH APRIL 1991.
Charitable objects
(A)THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF BRISTOL AT THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT.(B) IN OR TOWARDS THE UPKEEP AND REPAIR OF THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH OF ALL SAINTS.FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALL SAINTS CENTRE
1 ALL SAINTS COURT
BRISTOL
BS1 1JN
- Phone:
- 07581339406
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window