MARK PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE OF DERBYSHIRE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes and the relief of poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 November 1963: Standard registration
- (PROVINCIAL) MARK BENEVOLENT FUND (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Fred Mee | Trustee | 16 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Wyatt | Trustee | 16 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Griffiths | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Peter Gaskin | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Graeme Hutchinson | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.12k | £2.12k | £5.55k | £7.35k | £12.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.45k | £9.78k | £4.10k | £5.75k | £4.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 December 2023 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9TH MARCH 1957.
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF DISTRESSED MARK MASONS OR FREEMASONS THEIR WIDOWS AND CHILDREN, OR OTHER MASONIC CHARITIES, OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS SOCIETIES AND OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 HALLAM GRANGE ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S10 4BJ
- Phone:
- 07733007937
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window