Financial history IN MEMORIAM OF WILLIAM HANCOCK FUND

Charity number: 215124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.95k £7.06k £6.30k £6.30k £7.28k
Total expenditure £8.39k £7.50k £7.04k £6.30k £7.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A