INDUSTRIAL CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A national ecumenical membership organisation, helping Christians to relate their faith and work by providing resources, seminars, lectures
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 February 1963: Standard registration
- ICF (Working name)
- INDUSTRY CHURCHES FORUM (Previous name)
- THE INDUSTRIAL CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PHILIP ANDREW JUMP | Chair |
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rev William Edward John Mash | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Rev Dr John Weaver | Trustee | 08 November 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
DAVID EDMUND LAW | Trustee | 20 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.58k | £3.83k | £3.45k | £8.08k | £3.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.78k | £6.94k | £3.62k | £7.06k | £3.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26/04/1945 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 22/01/1981 AS AMENDED ON 14/06/1995 AS AMENDED ON 21/11/1997 AS AMENDED ON 15/07/2013
Charitable objects
1. TO PRESENT CHRIST AS THE LIVING LORD AND MASTER IN EVERY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN LIFE AND TO PROCLAIM THE SUPREME AUTHORITY OF THE CHRISTIAN LAW OF LOVE 2. TO MINISTER TO ALL ENGAGED IN THE INDUSTRIAL WORLD SEEKING TO WIN THEM TO PERSONAL DISCIPLESHIP OF JESUS CHRIST AND TO UNITE ALL CLASSES IN A BOND OF CHRISITAN FELLOWSHIP AND PRAYER 3. TO STUDY UNDER THE GUIDANCE OF THE HOLY SPIRIT HOW TO APPLY THE MORAL TRUTHS AND PRINCIPLES OF CHRISITANITY TO THE SOCIAL ECONOMIC AND INDUSTRIAL SYSTEMS OF THE WORLD
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
NW Baptist Association
The Resource Centre
Fleet Street
WIGAN
Lancashire
WN5 0DS
- Phone:
- 07951747388
- Email:
- admin@icf-online.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window