THE NEWCOMEN SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF THE HISTORY OF ENGINEERING AND TECHNOLOGY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Disseminating historical information to members of the Society and the general public, by way of meetings, discussion, correspondence, papers and visits to objects and places of interest & fostering historical investigation and research & encouraging the collection and preservation of examples & arranging for the presentation of original papers and publishing them
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Birmingham City
- Bristol City
- City Of London
- Manchester City
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Sheffield City
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 May 1963: Standard registration
- THE NEWCOMEN SOCIETY (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Felix Schmid | Chair | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
PROFESSOR DAVID PERRETT | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|||||||
Dr Jonathan Aylen | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Bowden | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
David Boursnell | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Turvey | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|||||||
Dr Francesco Gerali | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Edward Christopher Jump | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr John William Kanefsky | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Francis Grisdale Filcek | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Oliver Carpenter | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|||||||
Daniel H W Hayton | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.34k | £67.19k | £64.42k | £82.97k | £67.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.22k | £58.99k | £43.74k | £63.32k | £67.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 MAY 1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 DEC 1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 OCT 1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 JUN 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 JAN 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 JAN 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 APR 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 FEB 2023 as amended on 12 Jan 2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ENCOURAGE AND CO-ORDINATE THE STUDY OF THE HISTORY OF ENGINEERING, INDUSTRY AND TECHNOLOGY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1
Minster Court
Tuscam Way
Camberley
Surrey
- Phone:
- 07483 157952
- Email:
- office@newcomen.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window